+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 10, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0598)
On April 5, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 598 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 22, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 1996 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 11, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1448ER)
On February 27, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 23, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 964172146-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 964172146-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 964172146-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with sub. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 2-N)
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 968108492-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 968108492-H1
- Read second time
On February 11, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 1996 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 968108492-H1
- Reported from General Laws with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 6
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 964417812