+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0723)
- Enacted, Chapter 723 (effective 1/1/16)
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1444ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/27/15
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1444ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (95-Y 2-N)
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N)
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 1-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104222D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1444H1
On February 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 15104222D-H1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 2-N)
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2
On December 29, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100579D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
April 15, 2015: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
April 15, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N)
February 19, 2015: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2015: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 1-N)
February 10, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2015: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor