+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 25, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0163)
On March 17, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 163 (effective 7/1/99)
On February 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 16, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1441ER)
On February 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 10-N)
- Read third time and passed House (88-Y 10-N)
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 4-N)
On January 18, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On January 13, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 10/14/98 992004488
+ − Votes (5)
February 12, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1999: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 10-N)
January 29, 1999: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor