+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 19, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0484)
On April 12, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 484 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 19, 2004 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1441ER)
On March 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 3
On January 23, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 047395248
+ − Votes (7)
March 1, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2004: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2004: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2004: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor