+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 18, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0864)
On April 9, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 864 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 27, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 26, 1996 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 21, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1440ER)
On March 7, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (93-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments by Mr. Norment agreed to
- Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 2-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 1-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 2-N)
On March 4, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Passed by for the day
On March 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Public Education
On February 14, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Read first time
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 961124132-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 10, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed 961124132
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
March 7, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 1-N)
March 5, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 2-N)
March 5, 1996: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 29, 1996: Reported from Ed. & H. with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1996: Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor