+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0004)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 4 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Wednesday, February 18, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/11/15
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1440ER)
- Enrolled
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (31-Y 6-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Read third time
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (10-Y 2-N)
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
On December 26, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102737D
+ − Votes (5)
February 10, 2015: Passed Senate (31-Y 6-N)
February 6, 2015: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (10-Y 2-N)
January 28, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2015: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor