+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 3, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0223)
On April 2, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 223 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 6, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB144ER)
On February 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 26, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (95-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 3
On January 12, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed 002903716
+ − Votes (5)
February 24, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2000: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2000: Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor