+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 248 (effective 3/9/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0248)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1439ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Emergency clause added
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1439E
- Printed as engrossed 18104728D-E
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (20-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Presented and ordered printed 18104728D
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions