+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0333)
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 333 (effective 7/1/08)
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1437ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (67-Y 32-N)
- Read third time and passed House (67-Y 32-N)
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1437H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 083042444-H1
- Read second time
On February 9, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2008 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 083042444-H1
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (17-Y 5-N)
On January 14, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented and ordered printed 084789444
+ − Votes (5)
February 22, 2008: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2008: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2008: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (67-Y 32-N)
February 8, 2008: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (17-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor