+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Criminal & Procedure Law
On February 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 992587312-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Passed House (84-Y 12-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 12-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Reported from C. J. with amendment (23-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 13, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 07/17/98 992587312
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 21, 1999: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 12-N)
February 8, 1999: Reported from C. J. with amendment (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor