+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0542)
On April 15, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 542 (effective 4/15/98)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On April 2, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1431ER)
On March 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Taken up for immediate consideration
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Introduced at the request of Governor
- Presented & ordered printed w/emg. clause 989394811
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Reported from Finance (24-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional readings dispensed (88-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (90-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (90-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
+ − Votes (5)
March 16, 1998: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
March 16, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
March 16, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
March 13, 1998: Reported from Finance (24-Y 0-N)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (90-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor