+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Left in Finance
On February 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 4, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1994 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Read second time
On February 2, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD6320200 (HB143H1)
- Reported from Finance with sub. (21-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 12, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (2)
February 4, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1994: Reported from Finance with sub. (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor