+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0196)
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 196 (effective 7/1/08)
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1429ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 28, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (20-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed 088846428
+ − Votes (5)
February 19, 2008: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2008: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2008: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2008: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor