+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 413 (effective 3/23/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0413)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1428ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to (31-Y 7-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE 2 (98-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause 18104624D
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
+ − Votes (9)
February 27, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2018: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2018: Committee amendment agreed to (31-Y 7-N)
February 22, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: Reported from Local Government with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE 2 (98-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2018: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor