+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 1, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0763)
On April 8, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 763 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 24, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 22, 2000 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 16, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1428ER)
On March 7, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (96-Y 2-N)
On March 6, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 1-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 003562872-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 003562872-S1
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 3-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (38-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 003562872-S1
On March 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with sub (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 15, 2000 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 008238872-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 008238872-H1
- Communicated to Senate
- Read third time and passed House (91-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2000 in the House:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 13, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 2000 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 008238872-H1
On February 11, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with sub (25-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 4
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 001643204
+ − Votes (8)
March 7, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
March 3, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 1-N)
March 3, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 3-N)
March 3, 2000: VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2000: Reported from General Laws with sub (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 15, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2000: Reported from General Laws with sub (25-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor