+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 837 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0837)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1427ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (35-Y 0-N 4-A)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 1-N 1-A)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N 1-A)
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1427ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (19-Y 18-N 3-A)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (83-Y 14-N 2-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 14-N 2-A)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (18-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Presented and ordered printed 18104250D
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
+ − Votes (10)
April 18, 2018: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
April 18, 2018: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (35-Y 0-N 4-A)
April 18, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N 1-A)
February 28, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2018: Passed Senate (19-Y 18-N 3-A)
February 27, 2018: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2018: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 14-N 2-A)
February 1, 2018: Reported from Commerce and Labor (18-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor