+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On May 15, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0888)
On April 29, 1998 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1426ER)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 888 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recom. (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1426ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 1-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (99-Y 1-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 989771146-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 989771146-S1
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 989771146-S1
- Reported from Transportation w/sub. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 11, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (26-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 1
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 989543146
- Consent to introduce
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 1-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1998: Reported from Transportation w/sub. (15-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1998: Reported from Tra. (26-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor