+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2009 in Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 088702520-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1426E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On January 14, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 088702520
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 13, 2008: Continued to 2009 in Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2008: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor