+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 21, 2001 in the Senate:
- Left in Finance
On December 13, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 013280872-S1
On December 8, 2000 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from R. & S. S. w/substitute (9-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2001 in R. & S. S. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 15, 2000 in the House:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Motion to refer to App. committee rejected
- Printed as engrossed 003531872-E
- Engrossed by House
- Read third time and passed House (86-Y 12-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 12-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 2000 in the House:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 13, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 11, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amd (25-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 2
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 003531872
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
December 8, 2000: Reported from R. & S. S. w/substitute (9-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 25, 2000: Continued to 2001 in R. & S. S. (15-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 12-N)
February 11, 2000: Reported from General Laws with amd (25-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (81)
Type:
Primary Sponsor