+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0263)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 263 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1424ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (10-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
On December 23, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101131D