+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Left in Privileges and Elections
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2019 in Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE 2 (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented and ordered printed 18104141D