+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 4, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0729)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 729 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1423ER)
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (83-Y 15-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 15-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from Finance (20-Y 2-N)
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 30, 1998 in the House:
- Consent to introduce
- Presented & ordered printed 989651200
- Referred to Committee on Finance