+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0011)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 11 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2017
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/14/17
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1422ER)
- Enrolled
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1422H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 17104419D-H1
- Read second time
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 17104419D-H1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On November 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101059D
+ − Votes (5)
February 9, 2017: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2017: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2017: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor