+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 7, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Economic Development, Agriculture and Natural Resources(Cox)
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (17-Y 3-N)
On January 25, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned C & L sub: 3 Energy
On January 11, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented and ordered printed 088009456
+ − Vote
February 5, 2008: Reported from Commerce and Labor (17-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor