+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0516)
On April 15, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 516 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1419ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 984529811-E
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amd. (22-Y 0-N)
- Read first time
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Introduced at the request of Governor
- Presented & ordered printed 984529811
- Referred to Committee on Finance