+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Continued to 1995 in Finance (12-Y 3-N)
On February 21, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 18, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Amendment by Del. Newman agreed to
- Amendment by Del. Cranwell agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed LD1008812 (HB1412E)
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from Finance with amds. (19-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 28, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed
- Introduced at the request of Governor
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 8, 1994: Continued to 1995 in Finance (12-Y 3-N)
February 18, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1994: Reported from Finance with amds. (19-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor