+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 4, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0288)
On March 30, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 288 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1409ER)
On February 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1409H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 062470285-H1
- Read second time
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 062470285-H1
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 069825285
+ − Votes (5)
February 22, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2006: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2006: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor