+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 12, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0662)
On April 5, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 662 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 22, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 1996 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 19, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1407ER)
On March 5, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 964721416-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 964721416-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 964721416-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 10, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented & ordered printed 964139208
+ − Votes (6)
March 5, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
March 1, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 29, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 28, 1996: Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1996: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor