+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- House sustained Governor's veto
- 2/3 affirmitive votes required for passage
- Motion to pass in enrolled form rej. (60-Y 39-N 1-A)
- Placed on Calendar
- VOTE: (60-Y 39-N 1-A)
On March 24, 2003 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On February 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1406ER)
On February 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Amendments #s 5 & 6 by Sen. Edwards rejected (13-Y 26-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- VOTE: FLOOR AMEND 1,2,3,4 (17-Y 23-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments #s 1-4 by Sen. Edwards rejected (17-Y 23-N)
- VOTE: FLOOR AMEND 5,6 (13-Y 26-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Amendments #s 1-4 by Sen. Edwards rejected (14-Y 25-N)
- VOTE: FLOOR AMEND 1,2,3,4 (14-Y 25-N)
- Passed Senate (25-Y 14-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (25-Y 14-N)
- Amendments #s 1-4 by Sen. Edwards reconsidered (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (37-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (8-Y 6-N 1-A)
On February 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (57-Y 37-N 2-A)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 37-N 2-A)
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (56-Y 38-N 2-A)
- Engrossed by House (56-Y 38-N 2-A)
- Pending question ordered
- Passed by temporarily
- Read second time
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from Tra. (13-Y 6-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 10/10/02 031215636
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (11)
April 2, 2003: VOTE: (60-Y 39-N 1-A)
February 18, 2003: VOTE: FLOOR AMEND 1,2,3,4 (17-Y 23-N)
February 18, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (25-Y 14-N)
February 18, 2003: VOTE: FLOOR AMEND 1,2,3,4 (14-Y 25-N)
February 18, 2003: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2003: VOTE: FLOOR AMEND 5,6 (13-Y 26-N)
February 17, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2003: Reported from Transportation (8-Y 6-N 1-A)
February 4, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 37-N 2-A)
February 3, 2003: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (56-Y 38-N 2-A)
February 1, 2003: Reported from Tra. (13-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor