+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (10-Y 5-N)
On February 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Care
On February 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2008 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1400H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 080525686-H1
- Read second time
On January 30, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2008 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 080525686-H1
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented and ordered printed 080335686
+ − Votes (3)
February 28, 2008: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (10-Y 5-N)
February 1, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor