+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 4, 2020 in the House:
- Left in Education
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Continued to 2021 in Education by voice vote
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: SOL and SOQ
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101376D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor