+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 2, 2002 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0316)
On April 1, 2002 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 316 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 9, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB140ER)
On February 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (9-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 23, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 21, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 18, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from M., P. & P. S. (21-Y 0-N)
- Assigned to M., P. & P. S. sub-committee: 2
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/26/01 021187216