+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 11, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0493)
On April 8, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 493 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 30, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 29, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 28, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 21, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1399ER)
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 1-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (89-Y 1-N)
On March 8, 1994 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Amendments by Sen. Earley agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Passed by temporarily
- Read third time
On March 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On March 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed by for the day
On February 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (18-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 9, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 1-N)
March 3, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1994: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1994: Reported from Finance (18-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor