+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- Continued to 2007 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- Rereferred to Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
- Substitute by Delegate Gear agreed to 062367304-H1
- Floor substitute printed 062367304-H1 (Gear)
- Committee amendment rejected
- Read second time
On January 30, 2006 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 26, 2006 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 25, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (13-Y 7-N)
On January 13, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented and ordered printed 063802320
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
January 24, 2006: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (13-Y 7-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor