+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 14, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0701)
On April 5, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 701 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2006 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1398ER)
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (94-Y 2-N 1-A)
On January 30, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented and ordered printed 063794316
+ − Votes (5)
February 20, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2006: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2006: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N 1-A)
January 26, 2006: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor