+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 20, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0113)
On March 16, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 113 (effective 7/1/03)
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1398ER)
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (84-Y 14-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (84-Y 14-N)
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (25-Y 15-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (25-Y 15-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (37-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/amd (11-Y 1-N)
On February 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 18-N)
- Read third time and passed House (80-Y 18-N)
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments rejected
- Amendments by Del. Lingamfelter agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 035019822-E
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (15-Y 6-N)
On January 23, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 14, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Reported from Tra. w/amd (22-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 09/23/02 035019822