+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Rereferred to Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
On February 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (12-Y 10-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Public Safety
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (12-Y 9-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N)
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Presented and ordered printed 18104805D
+ − Votes (4)
February 9, 2018: Reported from Appropriations (12-Y 10-N)
February 8, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N)
February 2, 2018: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (12-Y 9-N)
February 1, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor