+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 30, 2018 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0730)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 730 (effective 7/1/18)
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1390ER)
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (80-Y 18-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 18107581D-S1 (80-Y 18-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (25-Y 14-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1390S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107581D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 18107581D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 4-N)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 24-N)
- Read third time and passed House (76-Y 24-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 7-N)
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #3
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Referred from Finance by voice vote
On January 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed 18104922D
+ − Votes (7)
March 5, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (80-Y 18-N)
March 1, 2018: Passed Senate with substitute (25-Y 14-N)
February 28, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2018: Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 4-N)
February 13, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 24-N)
February 9, 2018: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 7-N)
February 7, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor