+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0177)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 177 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1387ER)
- Enrolled
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (10-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: #3
On December 14, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100365D
+ − Votes (6)
February 11, 2013: Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2013: Reported from Transportation (10-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2013: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor