+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On February 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Left in Finance
On February 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Pursuant to S. Rule 20(j), rerefer. by C.J. (12-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 6-N)
- Read third time and passed House (91-Y 6-N)
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (23-Y 1-N)
On January 20, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 2-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 09/09/02 032219674
+ − Votes (4)
February 10, 2003: Pursuant to S. Rule 20(j), rerefer. by C.J. (12-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 6-N)
January 27, 2003: Reported from Appropriations (23-Y 1-N)
January 20, 2003: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor