+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On January 28, 2002 in the House:
- Stricken from House calendar
On January 25, 2002 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 024037600-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 24, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from A., C. & N. R. w/amendments (19-Y 3-N)
- Reconsidered by Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
On January 16, 2002 in the House:
- Failed to report (defeated) in A., C. & N. R. (9-Y 12-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/26/01 024037600
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
January 23, 2002: Reported from A., C. & N. R. w/amendments (19-Y 3-N)
January 16, 2002: Failed to report (defeated) in A., C. & N. R. (9-Y 12-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor