+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0027)
- Enacted, Chapter 27 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB138ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On February 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB138ER)
- Enrolled
On February 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 10104621D-H1
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB138EH1
- Amendment by Delegate Pollard agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 10104621D-EH1
On January 28, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2010 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 10104621D-H1
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 5, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101520D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
March 4, 2010: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2010: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2010: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2010: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor