+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N)
On February 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On January 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 26, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (51-Y 45-N)
- Read third time and passed House (51-Y 45-N)
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1379E
- Printed as engrossed 23100713D-E
On January 24, 2023 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 23, 2023 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 20, 2023 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 18, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendment(s) (12-Y 9-N)
On January 17, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N)
On January 16, 2023 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: K-12
On November 4, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100713D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
February 16, 2023: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N)
January 26, 2023: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 45-N)
January 18, 2023: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (12-Y 9-N)
January 17, 2023: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor