+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 27, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0954)
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 954 (effective 7/1/94)
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOVERNOR'S RECOMM. (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
On April 12, 1994 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 29, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 28, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 21, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1378ER)
On March 8, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 2-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (94-Y 2-N)
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with amd. (11-Y 2-N)
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (89-Y 11-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 11-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD7922460 (HB1378E)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amds. (15-Y 5-N)
On January 27, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 4
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: ADOPT GOVERNOR'S RECOMM. (39-Y 0-N)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
March 8, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 2-N)
March 4, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
March 2, 1994: Reported from General Laws with amd. (11-Y 2-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 11-N)
February 12, 1994: Reported from General Laws with amds. (15-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor