+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 247 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0247)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1377ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 18107130D-S1 (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107130D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1377S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Committee substitute printed 18107130D-S1
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Professions
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 12, 2018 in the House:
- Presented and ordered printed 18104300D
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions