+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 4, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0287)
On March 30, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 287 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 11, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1372ER)
On March 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 064407260
+ − Votes (5)
March 3, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2006: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2006: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor