+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 346 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0346)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1372ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- VOTE: ADOPTION (81-Y 17-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (81-Y 17-N)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (11-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 19-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (79-Y 19-N 1-A)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (21-Y 1-N)
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 12, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed 18104175D
+ − Votes (7)
February 26, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (81-Y 17-N)
February 22, 2018: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 1-N)
February 21, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: Reported from Finance with amendment (11-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 19-N 1-A)
January 29, 2018: Reported from Finance (21-Y 1-N)
January 26, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor