+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- Continued to 1997 in Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N)
On February 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Criminal Justice
On February 15, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (97-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 961195442-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
- Constitutional readings dispensed
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Passed by for the day
On February 10, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 961195442
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 28, 1996: Continued to 1997 in Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1996: Reported from C. J. with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor