+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Stricken at request of Patron in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 17, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (93-Y 7-N)
- Read third time and passed House (93-Y 7-N)
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 048814396-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1370H1
On February 14, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 048814396-H1
- Reported from P. & E. w/substitute (20-Y 2-N)
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 4
On January 22, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed w/emg. clause 044751396