+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 14, 2008 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0430)
On March 7, 2008 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 430 (effective 7/1/08)
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 29, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB137ER)
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 28, 2008 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On January 25, 2008 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB137H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 083359676-H1
- Read second time
On January 24, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2008 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 083359676-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
On December 20, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 087917676
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
February 27, 2008: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2008: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2008: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2008: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2008: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2008: Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor